W.V.G. v. Billings Clinic et al
Plaintiff: W.V.G
Defendant: Billings Clinic and Maureen C. Lucas
Case Number: 1:2017cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/7/2018. (JDR)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the pending motions to strike (Docs. 33, 37) are DENIED AS MOOT, and all pending deadlines, including the Final Pretrial Conference and Trial, set forth in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 31) are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/16/2018. (JDR)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF MINOR'S CLAIMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/6/2018. (JDR)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/3/2018. (JDR)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 46 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/21/2018. (AEC)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CERTIFICATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2403 AND FED. R. CIV. P. 5.1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/16/2017. (Hard copy mailed to the Office of Attorney General for the State of Montana, as directed.) (JDR)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 Motion to File 24 Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the clerk of court file 24 under seal. Defendant shall have leave to file a redacted version of 24 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/10/2017. (AEC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.V.G. v. Billings Clinic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billings Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen C. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.V.G
Represented By: Michael G. Eiselein
Represented By: Larry G. Grubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?