Allison v. Farmer Bros Co.
Plaintiff: Wayne Allison
Defendant: Farmer Bros Co.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of defendant Farmer Bros Co. against plaintiff Wayne Allison. (EMH)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 40 Motion in Limine. In light of this Court's July 27, 2018, Order, granting Farmer Bros. summary judgment, the motion is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/27/2018. (EMH)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Mark S. Posard. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/15/2017. (Copy mailed to attorney Posard.) (JDR)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER : Consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge having been withheld or met with objection, this case remains assigned to Honorable Susan P. Watters, United States District Judge and referred to Honorable Timothy J. Cavan, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/3/2017. (EMH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allison v. Farmer Bros Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Allison
Represented By: Joe C. Seifert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmer Bros Co.
Represented By: Nancy M. Erfle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?