Jones v. Schaps et al
Plaintiff: Garry L. Jones
Defendant: Nicholas R. Schaps, II, TN Transport, Inc. and J&S Energy, LLC
Counter_claimant: TN Transport, Inc., Nicholas R. Schaps, II and J&S Energy, LLC
Counter_defendant: Garry L. Jones
Case Number: 1:2017cv00014
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/26/2018. (JEC)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER, On December 15, 2017, the Court ordered the parties to file a stipulation to dismiss together with a proposed order dismissing the case within thirty days (Doc. 38). No stipulation having been filed as of today's date, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties file a joint stipulation showing cause why no such stipulation to dismiss has been filed by Monday, January 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/22/2018. (EMH)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff Garry L. Jones' motion to admit Andrew P. Muller to appear pro hac vice (Doc. 14) is GRANTED and he is authorized to appear as counsel with David R. Paoli pursuant to L.R. 83.1 (d) in the above captioned matter. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/17/2017. (Copy Order with CMRCF registration letter mailed to PHV atty Muller) (PHV notification to S.N and K.H in Msla) (EMH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Schaps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry L. Jones
Represented By: Andrew P. Muller
Represented By: David R. Paoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas R. Schaps, II
Represented By: Eric Edward Nord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TN Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Edward Nord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&S Energy, LLC
Represented By: Eric Edward Nord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: TN Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Edward Nord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nicholas R. Schaps, II
Represented By: Eric Edward Nord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: J&S Energy, LLC
Represented By: Eric Edward Nord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Garry L. Jones
Represented By: Andrew P. Muller
Represented By: David R. Paoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?