Barker et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: James L. Barker and Jeanne A. Barker
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Onewest Bank, Cit Bank, N.A., First American Title Company of Montana, Inc. and Charles Peterson
Case Number: 1:2017cv00021
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: PARK
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00021-SPW, 1:17-cv-00055-SPW-TJC (AMC)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. Amended Complaint or Stipulation for Dismissal due by 11/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/30/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00021-SPW-TJC, 1:17-cv-00055-SPW-TJC (JDR)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED ORDER- The Court vacates the judgment (Doc. 31) and the case shall remain open. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/15/2018. (AMC)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant's against Plaintiff's. (AMC)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:17-cv-00021-SPW-TJC Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00021-SPW-TJC, 1:17-cv-00055-SPW-TJC (AEC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Barker
Represented By: Karl Knuchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne A. Barker
Represented By: Karl Knuchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Mark D. Etchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onewest Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cit Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Company of Montana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?