Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. Matteson et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Kristie Matteson, Jay Matteson, Taylor Stephenson, Travis Stephenson and Nathon Ewalt
Counter_claimant: Taylor Stephenson, Travis Stephenson, Kristie Matteson and Nathon Ewalt
Counter_defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv00031
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER adopting 48 Findings and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that the proposed Findings and Recommendation for disposition of this matter entered by United States Magistrate Judge Cavan (Doc. 48) are ADOPTED IN FULL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions (Docs. 20, 21, and 31) be DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case be REMANDED to the Montana Thirteenth Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/3/2018. (EMH)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ALL COUNTER-CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE. This dismissal shall not inpact the interpleader portion of this case Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/13/2017. (AMC)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER on Rule 56(d) Motion. Stephensons' request is GRANTED. The Court will not set a case schedule at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/18/2017. SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS AS TO EXTENDED DEADLINES. (JDR)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to File Under Seal with exception. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/29/2017. (SEE ORDER FOR EXCEPTION) (JDR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. Matteson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dale R. Cockrell
Represented By: Kevin M. Funyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristie Matteson
Represented By: Andrew J. Miller
Represented By: Paul D. Odegaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Matteson
Represented By: Andrew J. Miller
Represented By: Paul D. Odegaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Stephenson
Represented By: David P. Legare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Stephenson
Represented By: David P. Legare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathon Ewalt
Represented By: Matthew I. Tourtlotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Taylor Stephenson
Represented By: David P. Legare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Travis Stephenson
Represented By: David P. Legare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kristie Matteson
Represented By: Andrew J. Miller
Represented By: Paul D. Odegaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nathon Ewalt
Represented By: Matthew I. Tourtlotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dale R. Cockrell
Represented By: Kevin M. Funyak
Represented By: Dale R. Cockrell
Represented By: Kevin M. Funyak
Represented By: Dale R. Cockrell
Represented By: Kevin M. Funyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?