Gonzalez v. Peterson

Petitioner: Hector Guillermo Smith Mac Donald Gonzalez
Respondent: Whitney Merlynn Peterson
Case Number: 1:2017cv00034
Filed: March 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: PARK
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 40 Motion Kelly A. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2008905.) filed by Whitney Merlynn Peterson and 39 Motion Stephen J. Cullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2008904.) filed by Whitney Merlynn Peterson. The motions are denied because this action was dismissed without prejudice on September 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/12/2017. (EMH)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Quash Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/16/2017. (EMH)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 21 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Third-Party Discovery Prior to Rule 26() Conference is GRANTED. Petitioner may conduct discovery for the limited purpose of trying to determine Respondent's whereabouts for purposes of service of process. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/7/2017. (EMH)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Vacate Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Hearing on Petitioner's Temporary Restraining Order set for Friday, April 7, 2017 at 1 :30 p.m. is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 10) entered by the Court on March 16, 2017 is VACATED subject to refiling upon service of the Respondent. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/5/2017. (EMH)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Extend Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order 10 . The Tuesday March 28, 2017 hearing is VACATED and RESET for Friday, April 7, 2017, at 1:30 PM. The Temporary Restraining Order entered on March 16, 2017 (Doc. 10) is extended an additional 14 days to expire April 13, 2017 at midnight. All other provisions contained in the Temporary Restraining Order remain in full effect. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/24/2017. (EMH) Modified on 3/24/2017 copy Order mailed to respondant (EMH).
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion To Utilize Interpreter at Hearing. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/23/2017. (AMC) Modified on 3/23/2017 copies of docket entry 10 and 13 mailed to respondent(AMC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hector Guillermo Smith Mac Donald Gonzalez
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Whitney Merlynn Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?