Price v. US Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: R. Michael Price
Defendant: US Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00036
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/25/2018. (AMC)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 59 Notice of Settlement filed by US Bank, N.A., IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this Order, the parties shall filed a stipulation to dismiss together with a proposed order dismissing the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines are VACATED. The final pretrial conference set for 6/5/2019 is VACATED and the bench trial set for 6/17/2019 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/20/2018. (EMH)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 50 Motion to Compel. Therefore, US Bank is ordered to produce an unredacted copy of Doc. 51-4. US Bank does not have to produce unredacted copies of the other documents. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs because the motion is granted in part and denied in part. Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5)(C). Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/31/2018. (AMC)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re 50 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and for Attorney Fees filed by R. Michael Price. US Bank is ordered to submit unredacted copies of the communications in question to the Court for in camera review by August 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/27/2018. (EMH)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER, Motions terminated: 41 MOTION for Protective Order filed by R. Michael Price. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/7/2018. (EMH)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM "Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed.R.Civ.P." filed by US Bank, N.A. and denying 18 MOTION To Excuse or Suspend Performance filed by R. Michael Price. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/25/2017. (EMH)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for June 30, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. and the deadlines for the related disclosures set forth in this Court's Order dated May 16, 2017, are hereby VACATED until such time that t he Court rules on 20 U.S. Bank's pending Motion to Dismiss. The Court will issue a new Order resetting those dates and deadlines as appropriate following its ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/23/2017. (EMH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. US Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Michael Price
Represented By: Michael F. McGuinness
Represented By: James A. Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?