Shoshone Tribe of the Wind River Reservation v. Zinke et al

Plaintiff: Shoshone Tribe of the Wind River Reservation
Defendant: Ryan Zinke, United States Department of Interior, United States Bureau of Indian Affairs, Michael Black, Darryl LaCounte, Louise Reyes, Norma Gourneau and Ray Nation
Case Number: 1:2017cv00045
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2018 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 44 Motion to Stay. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report every 90 days advising the Court on the potential dismissal of this matter. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/27/2018. (AMC)
January 4, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT 35 Motion to Access a Copy of the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/3/2018. (Copy of order mailed to Baldwin, Crocker & Rudd P.C.) (AMC)
September 18, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER -READ FOR COMPLETE DETAILS( Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2018 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris.) ( Cross Motions due by 12/15/2017, Motions due by 11/17/2017.) Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/18/2017. (AMC)
April 13, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark A. Echo Hawk for Shoshone Tribe of the Wind River Reservation. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/13/2017. (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoshone Tribe of the Wind River Reservation v. Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoshone Tribe of the Wind River Reservation
Represented By: Mark A. Echo Hawk
Represented By: Majel Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Indian Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl LaCounte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Gourneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Nation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?