LaForge v. Gets Down et al
Plaintiff: Michael F. LaForge
Defendant: Janice Gets Down, Natasha S. Morton, Leroy Not Afraid and Sheila Wilkenson Not Afraid
Case Number: 1:2017cv00048
Filed: April 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: BIG HORN
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Janice Gets Down against Plaintiff Michael F. LaForge. (Mailed to LaForge with copy of Court's Order) (EMH)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; It is ordered that LaForge's Motion to File Evidence 32 is construed as a motion to amend LaForge's Complaint and is granted; It is further ordered that Defendant Natasha Morton's Request for Dismissal With Prejudice 34 is granted. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/18/2018. Copy sent via US Mail to plaintiff. (JEC)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 30 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED IN PART AND REJECTED IN PART; 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITH LEAVE TO AMEND ; 13 Motion to Submit Support of Pleading Evidence is GRANTED ; 14 Motion To File Exhibits is GRANTED; 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution is DENIED as moot; 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; 24 Motion for Prayer for Relief is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/8/2018. (Hard copy mailed to pro se plaintiff Michael LaForge.) (JDR)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Kenneth J. Pfaehler. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 8/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/24/2017. (JDR) Modified on 7/24/2017: hard copy mailed to pro se plaintiff (JDR).
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint is deemed filed on May 5, 2017. The Clerk shall created a new docket entry so reflecting. Service of the Complaint and Summons on Defendants is authorized. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/9/2017. (Copy mailed to Mr. LaForge) (AMC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaForge v. Gets Down et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael F. LaForge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Gets Down
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha S. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Not Afraid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Wilkenson Not Afraid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?