Wildearth Guardians et al v. Zinke et al
Plaintiff: Wildearth Guardians and Montana Environmental Information Center
Defendant: Ryan Zinke, U.S. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, U.S. Department of the Interior, Marcello Calle, David Berry, Glenda Owens and Katharine MacGregor
Case Number: 1:2017cv00080
Filed: June 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/17/2019. (EMH)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kristina R. Van Bockern for Spring Creek Coal LLC. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/24/2018.
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part 30 Motion for Relief from Requirements of Local Rule 56.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/30/2018. (JDR)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew C. Emrich for Spring Creek Coal LLC. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/17/2018. (JDR)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Shannon Laun. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 12/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/15/2017. (Hard copy to S. Laun.) (JDR)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Intervene Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 9/22/2017. (AEC)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Samantha M. Ruscavage-Barz for Wildearth Guardians. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/30/2017. (JDR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wildearth Guardians et al v. Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildearth Guardians
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Laura King
Represented By: Samantha M. Ruscavage-Barz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Laura King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcello Calle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katharine MacGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?