Scheitzach v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Arlene Scheitzach
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and Does I-V
Case Number: 1:2017cv00100
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled cause is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/3/2019. (EMH)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER. The Court has been notified of the settlement of this case. Dismissal Papers due by 7/24/2019. Pending Motions are denied as moot. Pending deadlines and hearings are vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/24/2019. (JDR)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 33 Stipulation filed by Arlene Scheitzach. Motion Hearing RESET for 12/11/2018 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/21/2018. (AEC)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Joint Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/29/2018. (JDR)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS ORDERED that the proposed 10 Findings and Recommendations entered by United States Magistrate Judge Cavan are ADOPTED IN FULL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Wells Fargo's partial motion to dismiss 4 is GRANTED. Counts II and III of the complaint are dismissed with prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/16/2018. (EMH)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/28/2017. (JDR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scheitzach v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Scheitzach
Represented By: G. Patrick HagEstad
Represented By: Hannah Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Michelle L. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?