Horton v. Tipton et al

Plaintiff: Hal Horton
Defendant: Jennifer Tipton and SleekEZ, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00114
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Referring Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned cause is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to the terms of the confidential Mutual Release and Settlement Agreement signed by the parties. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/14/2018. (EMH)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge having been withheld or met with objection, this case remains assigned to the Honorable Susan P. Watters, United States District Judge, and referred to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/2/2018. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/2/2018. (AEC)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Defendant motion to admit Eric D. Hone pro hac vice is GRANTED. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/1/2018. (Mailed to Attorney and advised clerk of address change) Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/16/2018. (AEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Tipton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hal Horton
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Represented By: Casey Heitz
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SleekEZ, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?