Farm Credit Services of North Dakota PCA v. A & C Soaring Eagle Trucking et al
Plaintiff: Farm Credit Services of North Dakota PCA
Defendant: A & C Soaring Eagle Trucking and Clinton R. Mullin, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00117
Filed: August 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: RICHLAND
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER STAYING CASE. The bench trial set for October 15, 2018, and all related deadlines are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must provide the Court with a status report on the progress of the bankruptcy proceeding by every February 1 and August 1 going forward. Additionally, Plaintiff shall file a status report within thirty days of the conclusion of the bankruptcy case. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/24/2018. (NOS)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan recused. PPTC set for 11/30/2017 is VACATED and will be rescheduled following reassignment of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/27/2017. (DLC chambers notified by email.) (JDR)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ALLOW ATTENDANCE AT PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/13/2017. (JDR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Credit Services of North Dakota PCA v. A & C Soaring Eagle Trucking et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Credit Services of North Dakota PCA
Represented By: William D. Lamdin, III
Represented By: Lindy M. Lauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & C Soaring Eagle Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton R. Mullin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?