Lar v. Billings School District
Plaintiff: Connie Lar
Defendant: Billings School District
Case Number: 1:2017cv00127
Filed: September 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled cause is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fee's. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/1/2019. (EMH)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS ORDERED that the proposed 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS entered by the United States Magistrate Judge are ADOPTED IN FULL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant's 3 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/4/2018. (EMH)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/6/2017. (JDR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lar v. Billings School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Lar
Represented By: Kevin William Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billings School District
Represented By: Mary E. Duncan
Represented By: Jeana R. Lervick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?