Schwartz , M.D. v. Associated Employers Group Benefit Plan and Trust et al

Plaintiff: Lauren F. Schwartz , M.D.
Defendant: Associated Employers Group Benefit Plan and Trust and Employee Benefit Management Systems
Case Number: 1:2017cv00142
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Billings Office
County: XX out of state
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2018 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying EBMS's 45 Motion to Strike the affidavit as moot. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/6/2018. (EMH)
May 16, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Robert Solomon) Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/16/2018. (JEC)
March 23, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Samuel S. Saltman. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/23/2018. (Copy mailed to atty) (AMC)
January 17, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, For the foregoing reasons, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, The motions to dismiss are DENIED as to Counts 1 and The motions to dismiss are GRANTED as to Count 3. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/16/2018. (EMH)
November 9, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff Lauren F. Schwartz, M.D. 's motion to admit Michael Gottlieb to appear pro hac vice (Doc. 7) is GRANTED and he is authorized to appear as counsel with Colin Gerstner pursuant to L.R. 83.l(d) in the above captioned matter. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/8/2017. (S.N. notified to add attorney to database. Copy Order and CM ECF requirements mailed to PHV attorney M. Gottlieb). (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwartz , M.D. v. Associated Employers Group Benefit Plan and Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren F. Schwartz , M.D.
Represented By: Colin M. Gerstner
Represented By: Michael Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Employers Group Benefit Plan and Trust
Represented By: John R. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employee Benefit Management Systems
Represented By: Robert C. Lukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?