Marcotte v. Midland Funding LLC et al

Plaintiff: Laurie Marcotte
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC, TransUnion LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00003
Filed: January 4, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Referring Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE all claims against Equifax. As Equifax was the last remaining defendant, all deadlines and dates set by the Court are VACATED, and this case is now closed. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/9/2018. (AMC)
July 12, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/12/2018. (AEC)
April 17, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Angela M. Taylor for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/17/2018. (JDR)
April 10, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge having been withheld or met with objection, this case remains assigned to Judge Susan P. Watters and is referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/10/2018. (AEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcotte v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Marcotte
Represented By: Colin M. Gerstner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?