Western Builders Supply, Inc. v. Skiles et al

Plaintiff: Western Builders Supply, Inc.
Defendant: Steve Skiles, Andrew Strong, Steve Rux, Richard C. Wilcox, Paul Wagness, Cynthia Kuehn and Fastar LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00053
Filed: March 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. This action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/7/2019. (JDR)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/11/2018. (S.N. notified to add atty to database)(Copy Order with CM ECF registration letter mailed to atty) (AEC)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Andrew Strong; granting 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Paul Wagness; 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Fil e Answer filed by Steve Rux; granting 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Richard C. Wilcox.Steve Rux answer due 5/4/2018; Andrew Strong answer due 5/4/2018; Paul Wagness answer due 5/4/2018; Richard C. Wilcox answer due 5/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/16/2018. (Hard copy mailed to pro se filers Strong, Wagness, Rux Wilcox, Kuehn.) (JDR) Modified on 4/16/2018 (JDR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Builders Supply, Inc. v. Skiles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Builders Supply, Inc.
Represented By: John G. Crist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Skiles
Represented By: Colin M. Gerstner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Wagness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Kuehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fastar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?