Anderson v. Mountain View Pizza Co. et al

Plaintiff: Mike Anderson
Defendant: Mountain View Pizza Co., Black Hills Pizza, Inc. and Choose the Right Pizza, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00058
Filed: March 26, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Referring Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2018 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Sean Cooper admitted to practice with William A. D'Alton to act as local counsel. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 8/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/1/2018. (JDR)
June 29, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING FILING. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed as Doc. 37 shall be STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/29/2018. (JDR)
June 11, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/11/2018. (See Order for telephone access instructions.) (JDR)
June 7, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/7/2018. (JDR)
April 16, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Plaintiffs motion to admit Mark A. Potashnick pro hac vice is GRANTED. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/16/2018. (AEC)
April 9, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice ; denying 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice. Plaintiff may resubmit its motions, provided the motions are accompanied by affidavits that comply in full with L.R. 83.1(d)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/9/2018. (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Mountain View Pizza Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Anderson
Represented By: William D'Alton
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain View Pizza Co.
Represented By: Veronica T. von Grabow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hills Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Veronica T. von Grabow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choose the Right Pizza, LLC.
Represented By: Veronica T. von Grabow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?