SAMM, LLC et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Elite Mechanical, Sam Sparks, Michelle Sparks, SAMM, LLC and Sparks, Inc.
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00115
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Ann E. Davey, John R. Vincent, and John E. Bohyer. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 10/15/2018. (JDR)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/6/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/6/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/6/2018. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 9/26/2018. (JDR)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Bohyer, John)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sparks, Inc., Michelle Sparks, SAMM, LLC, Sam Sparks, Elite Mechanical. The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on The Ohio Casualty Ins. Co., #2 Letter from Montana Commissioner of Insurance confirming service on The Ohio Casualty Ins. Co.) (Davey, Ann)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sparks, Inc., Michelle Sparks, SAMM, LLC, Sam Sparks, Elite Mechanical. Ohio Security Insurance Company served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on Ohio Security Insurance Co., #2 Letter from Montana Commissioner of Insurance confirming service on Ohio Security Ins. Co.) (Davey, Ann)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sparks, Inc., Michelle Sparks, SAMM, LLC, Sam Sparks, Elite Mechanical. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on Liberty Mutual Ins. Co., #2 Letter from Montana Commissioner of Insurance confirming service on Liberty Mutual Ins. Co.) (Davey, Ann)
August 9, 2018 Remark: Attorney John R. Vincent is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFs. (JDR)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Correction: re #1 Complaint,. The filing error relates to: Improper Signature. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. Please refer to L.R. 11.1(b). (JDR)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. (Originals to be picked up by law office.) (JDR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2018: #1 Summons Issued to Ohio Casualty Insurance Company) (JDR). Modified on 8/8/2018: Original entry contains a duplicate summons to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Correction made w/additional attachment (JDR).
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk of Court notifying attorney John R. Vincent of CM/ECF requirements. (Mailed to J. R. Vincent.) (JDR)
August 7, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2175678 (JDR) Modified on 8/8/2018 to correct filed date (JDR).
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Sparks, Inc., Michelle Sparks, SAMM, LLC, Sam Sparks, Elite Mechanical. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR) Modified on 8/8/2018 to correct filed date (JDR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAMM, LLC et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Mechanical
Represented By: Ann E. Davey
Represented By: John R. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Sparks
Represented By: Ann E. Davey
Represented By: John R. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sparks
Represented By: Ann E. Davey
Represented By: John R. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMM, LLC
Represented By: Ann E. Davey
Represented By: John R. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sparks, Inc.
Represented By: Ann E. Davey
Represented By: John R. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Bohyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Bohyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Bohyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?