Sticka v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Christina Loyce Sticka
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00120
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Leisa Wolf on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Wolf, Leisa)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (AEC)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of Service) (Copies conventionally mailed to the Acting Commissioner of SSA, US Attorney General and US Attorney as directed in the Order.) (JDR)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filed by Christina Loyce Sticka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JEC) Modified on 8/15/2018: Order granting IFP motion entered and Complaint is deemed filed. NEF regenerated. (JDR).
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. John E. Seidlitz, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Christina Loyce Sticka. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sticka v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Loyce Sticka
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Leisa Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?