Eriksen et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Cassity and Melony Eriksen
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, DeBuy Products, Inc., Depuy International, Ltd. and DePuy Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00122
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Steven Cassity, Melony Eriksen (Albini, Dianna)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk of Court notifying PHV attorney Dianna L. Albini of CM/ECF registration requirements. (Conventionally mailed to Ms. Albini on this date) (JDR)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion Dianna L. Albini to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 9/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/24/2018. (JDR)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION Dianna L. Albini to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2184297.) Jacquelyn M. Hughes appearing for Plaintiff Melony Eriksen Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dianna L. Albini, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission) (Hughes, Jacquelyn)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to defendants DeBuy Products, Inc., DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy International, Ltd., Johnson & Johnson. Summonses also issued as to DePuy Synthes, Inc. and Medical Devices Business Service, Inc. (Originals mailed to J. Hughes.) (JDR)
August 16, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2180765 (JDR)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against DeBuy Products, Inc., DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy International, Ltd., Johnson & Johnson, filed by Melony Eriksen and Steven Cassity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eriksen et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Cassity
Represented By: Jacquelyn M. Hughes
Represented By: Dianna L. Albini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melony Eriksen
Represented By: Jacquelyn M. Hughes
Represented By: Dianna L. Albini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeBuy Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy International, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?