United States of America v. $110,000 in U. S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $110,000 in U. S. Currency
Case Number: 1:2018cv00124
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION Declaration of Publication of Notices of Forfeiture Action Against Personal Property by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Advertisement Certification Report) (Francis, Victoria)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT of Known Potential Claimants, Justin James Wood, Sherry Meyoka Wood, Melva Romares, and Timothy F. Wood. (JDR)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION Declaration in Support of United States' Motion for Entry of Default of Known Potential Claimants, Justin James Wood, Sherry Meyoka Wood, Melva Romares Wood, and Timothy F. Wood. by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 US First Class Mailing to Sebastian Ohanian, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Domestic Return Receipt for Sebastian Ohanian, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 US First Class Mailing to Justin James Wood, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Domestic Return Receipt for Justin James Wood, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 US First Class Mailing to Sherry Meyoka Wood, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Domestic Return Receipt for Sherry Meyoka Wood, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 US First Class Mailing to Melva Romares Wood, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Domestic Return Receipt for Melva Romares Wood, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 US First Class Mailing to Timothy Wood) (Francis, Victoria)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default United States' Motion for Entry of Default of Known Potential Claimants, Justin James Wood, Sherry Meyoka Wood, Melva Romares Wood, and Timothy F. Wood. Victoria L. Francis appearing for Plaintiff United States of America Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Clerk's Entry of Default of Known Potential Claimants, Justin James Wood, Sherry Meyoka Wood, Melva Romares Wood, and Timothy F. Wood) (Francis, Victoria)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 USM-285 USM 285 Return Executed on 09/06/2018. (Francis, Victoria)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued by the Clerk of Court. Original warrant delivered to the USA. (JDR)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem to Daniel Ball (Francis, Victoria)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem Application for Warrant of Arrest In Rem Victoria L. Francis appearing for Plaintiff United States of America Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Warrant of Arrest In Rem) (Francis, Victoria)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Francis, Victoria)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $110,000 in U. S. Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $110,000 in U. S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $110,000 in U. S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?