Brandt v. Old Dominion Freight Line Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Brandt
Defendant: Scott Goodrich, Tom Lillywhite, John Doe Defendants 1-6 and Old Dominion Freight Line Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00128
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Kevin Brandt. (Tourtlotte, Matthew)
October 19, 2018 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Old Dominion Freight Line Inc.. (Mahe, Kathryn)
October 19, 2018 10 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Kevin Brandt. (Tourtlotte, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Kevin Brandt. (Tourtlotte, Matthew)
September 6, 2018 8 Def Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.'s ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Old Dominion Freight Line Inc.. (Mahe, Kathryn)
September 6, 2018 7 STATE COURT CASE FILE Received electronically from 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County, case number DV-56-2018-0001051-WS. (EMH)
September 6, 2018 6 PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND, filed by Kevin Brandt. (EMH)
September 6, 2018 5 COMPLAINT filed by Kevin Brandt. (EMH)
September 4, 2018 4 Featured Case PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/19/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/12/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/19/2018. Pretrial Conference Call set for 10/26/2018 at 09:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/4/2018. (EMH)
August 31, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Dominion Freight Line Inc.. (Mahe, Kathryn)
August 31, 2018 2 Def Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Old Dominion Freight Line Inc.. (Mahe, Kathryn)
August 24, 2018 Filing fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2184800 (AMC)
August 24, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (CASE NUMBER IS CV-18-128-BLG-SPW) by Old Dominion Freight Line Inc. from Yellowstone County State Court, case number DV-18-1051 filed by Old Dominion Freight Line Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of State Court Complaint, #3 Affidavit of Kathryn Mahe) (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandt v. Old Dominion Freight Line Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Lillywhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line Inc.
Represented By: Tessa A. Keller
Represented By: Kathryn Mahe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Brandt
Represented By: Matthew I. Tourtlotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?