Morrison v. Wind et al
Plaintiff: James Morrison
Defendant: Cindy Longjaw-Moore, John and Jane Does, Donavan Wind and BIA Rocky Mountain Regional Director
Case Number: 1:2018cv00132
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 Mail sent to Morrison at Lampman Dr, Billings Returned as Undeliverable. (TAG)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 Mail re #8 sent to Morrison at YCDF Returned as Undeliverable. (TAG)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Response due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/16/2018. Mailed to Morrison as directed with #6 , #7 . (TAG)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 Mail sent to Morrison at YCDF Returned as Undeliverable. (TAG)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Morrison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/10/2018. Mailed to Morrison and YCDF (TAG)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/10/2018. Mailed to Morrison (TAG)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE re Account Statement/Declaration and Objection by James Morrison (TAG)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Morrison with docket sheet (TAG)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by James Morrison. (TAG) Modified on 10/10/2018: complaint deemed filed (TAG).
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James Morrison. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Wind et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Longjaw-Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donavan Wind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIA Rocky Mountain Regional Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?