Horob v. Montana Department of Livestock
Plaintiff: Todd Kenneth Horob
Defendant: Montana Department of Livestock
Case Number: 1:2018cv00137
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/6/2018. Mailed to Horob (TAG)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. Filing fee/IFP due within 21 days of Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/5/2018. Mailed to Horob with ifp form (TAG)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Todd Kenneth Horob. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horob v. Montana Department of Livestock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Kenneth Horob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Livestock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?