Colstrip Energy LP v. JBED Ventures, LLC
Plaintiff: Colstrip Energy LP
Defendant: JBED Ventures, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00138
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JBED Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidvait ot Willard Huey) (McCann, M. Christy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant JBED Ventures, LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (McCann, M. Christy)
October 12, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against JBED Ventures, LLC, filed by Colstrip Energy LP. (Gardner, Trent)
October 9, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Colstrip Energy LP (Ferreti, George)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/4/2018. (JDR)
October 4, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Colstrip Energy LP re #14 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Diana R. Lotfi (Lotfi, Diana)
October 3, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colstrip Energy LP. (Gardner, Trent)
October 1, 2018 Filing 17 Letter from Clerk of Court notifying PHV Mitchell A. Margo of CM/ECF registration requirements. Mr. Margo will not receive NEFs until he becomes a registered e-filer. (Copy mailed to M. A. Margo) (JDR)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion Mitchell A. Margo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/1/2018. (JDR)
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 Letter from Clerk of Court notifying PHV attorney Diana R. Lotfi of CM/ECF registration requirements. (Hard copy mailed to D. Lofti.) (JDR)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 9/28/2018. (JDR)
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION Mitchell A. Margo to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2201079.) M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant JBED Ventures, LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mitch Margo, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McCann, M. Christy)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION Diana R. Lotfi to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2199480.) Trent M. Gardner appearing for Plaintiff Colstrip Energy LP Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Diana R. Lotfi, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gardner, Trent)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk of Court informing PHV attorney George Feretti of e-filing requirements. Hard copy mailed to attorney Feretti. (JDR)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 9/25/2018. (JDR)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 State Court Order. PHV admission of Diana R. Lofti to state court. (JDR)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against JBED Ventures, LLC, filed by Colstrip Energy LP. (JDR)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 STATE COURT FILE: DV-44-2018-39-DS, MT 16th Judicial District Court, Rosebud County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (JDR) Modified on 10/15/2018: File held on the open civil case filed shelf. (JDR).
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JBED Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Willard Huey) (McCann, M. Christy)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant JBED Ventures, LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (McCann, M. Christy)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JBED Ventures, LLC. (McCann, M. Christy)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION George M. Ferreti to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2197445.) Trent M. Gardner appearing for Plaintiff Colstrip Energy LP Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of George M. Ferreti, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gardner, Trent)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Trent M. Gardner, Oliver H. Goe, and M. Christy S. McCann. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 10/4/2018. (JDR)
September 14, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2194981 (JDR)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JBED Ventures, LLC from Montana 16th Judicial District Court, Rosebud County, case number DV-18-39., filed by JBED Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colstrip Energy LP v. JBED Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBED Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Oliver H. Goe
Represented By: M. Christy S. McCann
Represented By: Mitchell A. Margo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colstrip Energy LP
Represented By: Trent M. Gardner
Represented By: George M. Ferreti
Represented By: Diana R. Lotfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?