Cleveland v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: John T. Cleveland
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00143
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan (JDR)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Victoria L. Francis, Michael Sinclair Howard, Joel Grant Krautter. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 11/9/2018. (JEC)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sinclair Howard on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Howard, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (JDR)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons). Copies conventionally mailed to the Acting Commissioner of SSA, US Attorney General and US Attorney as directed in the Order. (JEC)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (IFP) against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by John T. Cleveland. (IFP motion pending.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JDR) Modified on 10/2/2018 (JEC). Order granting IFP motion entered and Complaint is deemed filed. NEF regenerated.
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Joel Grant Krautter appearing for Plaintiff John T. Cleveland. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Cleveland
Represented By: Joel Grant Krautter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Michael Sinclair Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?