Tangwell v. Wacker et al

Plaintiff: Donald Tangwell
Defendant: William Wacker and Barbara Wacker
Case Number: 1:2018cv00165
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Barbara Wacker, William Wacker. (Gunderson, Todd)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned. (TAG)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/10/2018. Mailed to Tangwell (TAG)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Tangwell with docket sheet (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE, #2 PRO SE REQUEST TO FILE BY EMAIL) (TAG)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Barbara Wacker, William Wacker. Originals mailed to Tangwell (TAG)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Donald Tangwell. (Attachment(s): #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG). Modified on 11/26/2018 to separately attach exhibit (TAG). Modified on 12/10/2018: complaint deemed filed (TAG).
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Donald Tangwell. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tangwell v. Wacker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wacker
Represented By: Todd D. Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Wacker
Represented By: Todd D. Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Tangwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?