Abel v. Austyn Spencer Enterprises, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Shawn Abel
Defendant: Austyn Spencer Enterprises, LLC, Rhett Hightower and Blue Sky Pizza, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00166
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/5/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/29/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/5/2019. TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/18/2019. (AMC)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Abel. Rhett Hightower served on 1/13/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (D'Alton, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Abel. Blue Sky Pizza, LLC served on 1/13/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (D'Alton, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Abel. Austyn Spencer Enterprises, LLC served on 1/13/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (D'Alton, William)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Remark: Admitted PHV attorney Eli Karsh can now receive electronic notices in this case. (EMH)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 CM ECF Registration letter mailed to admitted PHV attorney Eli Karsh. (S.N. notified to add attorney to database) (EMH)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Eli Karsh. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/27/2018. (Copy of order and CM ECF Registration letter mailed to attorney) (EMH)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark A. Potashnick for Shawn Abel. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/26/2018. (EMH)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2228589.) William D'Alton appearing for Plaintiff Shawn Abel (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (D'Alton, William)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION Mark A. Potashnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2228582.) William D'Alton appearing for Plaintiff Shawn Abel (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (D'Alton, William)
November 23, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Original and one copy mailed to attorney) (AMC)
November 21, 2018 Filing fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2227374 (AMC)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants filed by Shawn Abel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abel v. Austyn Spencer Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Abel
Represented By: William D'Alton
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Represented By: Eli Karsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austyn Spencer Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhett Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Sky Pizza, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?