Ducheneaux et al v. Lower Yellowstone Rural Electric Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mae Keller, Estate of Paul Ducheneaux, Deceased and Edward Ducheneaux
Defendant: Lower Yellowstone Rural Electric Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00006
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 19 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Edward Ducheneaux, Estate of Paul Ducheneaux, Deceased, Mae Keller. (Grubbs, Larry)
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Lower Yellowstone Rural Electric Association, Inc.. (Bancroft, Thomas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Edward Ducheneaux, Estate of Paul Ducheneaux, Deceased, Mae Keller. (Grubbs, Larry)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion TO ATTEND PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/18/2019. (JDR)
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION TO ATTEND PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TELEPHONICALLY Randall G. Nelson appearing for Defendant Lower Yellowstone Rural Electric Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Nelson, Randall)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Edward Ducheneaux, Estate of Paul Ducheneaux, Deceased, Mae Keller. (Barker, Kenneth)
February 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan added. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan and Judge Susan P. Watters no longer assigned to case. (JDR)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. (JDR)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #1 Duplicate consent received on 2/15/2019) (JDR).
February 11, 2019 Administrative Correction: re Set/Reset Deadlines. Deadline set in error. Answer has been filed. DISREGARD Answer deadline entry. (JDR)
February 11, 2019 Set Deadlines: Lower Yellowstone Rural Electric Association, Inc. answer due 2/22/2019. (JDR)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Correction: re #8 Certificate of Service. The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (JEC)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Kenneth E. Barker, Larry G. Grubbs, Randall G. Nelson. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/25/2019. (JEC)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/21/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/21/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/21/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/7/2019. (JDR)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Edward Ducheneaux, Estate of Paul Ducheneaux, Deceased, Mae Keller (Attachments: #1 Summons-returned) (Grubbs, Larry) Modified on 2/8/2019 to correct title/event. (JEC).
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Lower Yellowstone Rural Electric Association, Inc.. (Nelson, Randall)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Edward Ducheneaux, Estate of Paul Ducheneaux, Deceased, Mae Keller re #4 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Acknowledgment of Conditions of Pro Hac Vice Admission (Barker, Kenneth)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk of Court notifying PHV attorney Kenneth E. Barker of CM/ECF registration requirements. (Copy mailed to K. Barker) (JDR)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenneth E. Barker for Edward Ducheneaux,Kenneth E. Barker for Estate of Paul Ducheneaux, Deceased,Kenneth E. Barker for Mae Keller. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/31/2019. (JDR)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Kenneth E. Barker to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2257575.) Larry G. Grubbs appearing for Plaintiffs Edward Ducheneaux, Estate of Paul Ducheneaux, Deceased, Mae Keller Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kenneth E. Barker, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Grubbs, Larry)
January 24, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number MTX100015855. (EMH)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lower Yellowstone Rural Electric Association, Inc.. (original summons given to attorney for service) (EMH)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Lower Yellowstone Rural Electric Association, Inc. d/b/a Lower Yellowstone Rural Electric Cooperative, filed by Edward Ducheneaux and Mae Keller, as Co-Personal Representatives of the Estate of Paul Ducheneaux, Deceased. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ducheneaux et al v. Lower Yellowstone Rural Electric Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Keller
Represented By: Larry G. Grubbs
Represented By: Kenneth E. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Paul Ducheneaux, Deceased
Represented By: Larry G. Grubbs
Represented By: Kenneth E. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Ducheneaux
Represented By: Larry G. Grubbs
Represented By: Kenneth E. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lower Yellowstone Rural Electric Association, Inc.
Represented By: Randall G. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?