Nautilus Insurance Company v. Roan et al

Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Defendant: Dale Rambur, Rumbar Construction, Inc., Brittany Nichole Roan and Chad Michael Roan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00007
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 Nautilus Insurance Company's ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim brought by Chad and Brittany Roans by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Phillips, Robert)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan (JDR)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Robert J. Phillips, Luc L. Brodhead, Hayley C. Kemmick, R. Russell Plath. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/18/2019. (JEC)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/16/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/16/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/16/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/26/2019. (JDR)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Russell Plath on behalf of Brittany Nichole Roan, Chad Michael Roan (Plath, R.)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Nautilus Insurance Company by Chad Michael Roan, Brittany Nichole Roan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Refusal to Defend Letter) (Kemmick, Hayley)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES WITH PREJUDICE re: Stipulation of Dismissal #5 filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. DEFENDANTS DALE RAMBUR AND RAMBUR CONSTRUCTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/21/2019. (AMC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Phillips, Robert)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Nautilus Insurance Company to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Phillips, Robert)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nautilus Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Nautilus Insurance Company.. (Phillips, Robert)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brittany Nichole Roan, Chad Michael Roan. Originals sent via US Mail to plaintiff's counsel. (JEC)
January 25, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2255514. (JEC)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dale Rambur, Brittany Nichole Roan, Chad Michael Roan, Rumbar Construction, Inc. filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautilus Insurance Company v. Roan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Rambur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rumbar Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Nichole Roan
Represented By: R. Russell Plath
Represented By: Hayley C. Kemmick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Michael Roan
Represented By: R. Russell Plath
Represented By: Hayley C. Kemmick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Luc L. Brodhead
Represented By: Robert J. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?