Langford v. American National Insurance Service Company

Plaintiff: Alicia Langford
Defendant: American National Insurance Service Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Elizabeth Worth Lund appearing for Defendant American National Insurance Service Company Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lund, Elizabeth)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2019. Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/31/2019. Motions due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/13/2019. (JDR)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/12/2019. Order to follow. (SMD)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/5/2019. (JDR)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Alicia Langford. (Hughes, Jacquelyn)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Alicia Langford. (Hughes, Jacquelyn)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Alicia Langford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5-15-18 Letter from Public Works) (Hughes, Jacquelyn)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by American National Insurance Service Company. (Lund, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Mailing of Consent Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Sent to counsel Elizabeth Worth Lund and Jacquelyn M. Hughes. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/25/2019. (JDR)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against American National Insurance Service Company, filed by Alicia Langford. (JDR)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT FILE: DV-56-2019-26-BC, MT MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (JDR)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear by Telephone. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/6/2019. (AMC)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Attend Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Telephone Elizabeth Worth Lund appearing for Defendant American National Insurance Service Company Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lund, Elizabeth)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/5/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/5/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/5/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/5/2019. (AEC)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by American National Insurance Service Company. (Lund, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2019 Filing fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2258828 (AMC)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL CASE NUMBER IS CV-19-11-BLG-SPW-TJC by American National Insurance Service Company from Yellowstone County State Court, case number DV-19-0026 filed by American National Insurance Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhbit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langford v. American National Insurance Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Langford
Represented By: Jacquelyn M. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Insurance Service Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Worth Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?