Tipton et al v. Horton
Plaintiff: SleekEZ, LLC and Jennifer Tipton
Defendant: Hal Horton
Case Number: 1:2019cv00025
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/4/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/28/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/4/2019. TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 6/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/24/2019. (AMC)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by SleekEZ, LLC, Jennifer Tipton. (Zobell, Shalise)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's Verified ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against SleekEZ, LLC, Jennifer Tipton by Hal Horton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit News article, #2 Exhibit Dakota Dog letter) (Heitz, Casey)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #3 Sealed Motion for TRO Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/26/2019. (AMC)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 Proof of Service filed by Jennifer Tipton, SleekEZ, LLC. Service by Personal on 03/10/2019., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Tipton, SleekEZ, LLC. (Zobell, Shalise)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING re #3 SEALED MOTION FOR AN EMERGENCY TRO filed by SleekEZ, LLC, Jennifer Tipton. The Court will wait for Horton's response to the motion for preliminary injuction. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/5/2019. (AMC)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL VERIFIED COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS; MOTION FOR TRO AND BRIEF #1 Motion to File Under Seal Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/5/2019. (AMC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hal Horton. (Original and one copy mailed to attorney) (AMC)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT- BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TRO re: #1 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by SleekEZ, LLC, Jennifer Tipton. (AMC) Modified on 3/5/2019 (AMC).
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED MOTION FOR TRO re: #1 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by SleekEZ, LLC, Jennifer Tipton. (AMC) Modified on 3/5/2019 (AMC).
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT-VERIFIED COMPLAINT WITH EXHIBITS re: #1 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by SleekEZ, LLC, Jennifer Tipton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 250 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2 Settlement Agreement, #3 Exchibit 3 2-4-19 Amazon Inventory, #4 Exhibit 4 2-12-19 Amazon Inventory, #5 Exhibit 5 1-28-19 Walmart Receipt, #6 Exhibit 6 Cease and Desist, #7 Exhibit 7 11-28-18 Coleman Letter, #8 Exhibit 8 Nov. 2018 Receipts, #9 Exhibit 9 2-12-19 Groomninja.com receipt, #10 Exhibit 10 2-15-19 Cease and Desist, #11 Exhibit 11 Wood Invoices, #12 Exhibit 12 Excerpt Horton Deposition, #13 Exhibit 13 Horsetacko.com, #14 Exhibit 14 3-4-19 Groomninja.com, #15 Exhibit 15 3-4-19 Groom Ninja Amazon, #16 Exhibit 16 3-4-19 Groom Ninja Facebook, #17 Exhibit 17 Groom Ninja Google Results, #18 Exhibit 18 11-7-18 Cease and Desist, #19 Exhibit 19 Inc. 500 Article, #20 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC) Modified on 3/5/2019 to take out the text lodged (AMC).
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION UNDER SEAL Shalise C. Zobell appearing for Plaintiffs SleekEZ, LLC, Jennifer Tipton (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tipton et al v. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SleekEZ, LLC
Represented By: Shalise C. Zobell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Tipton
Represented By: Shalise C. Zobell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal Horton
Represented By: Casey Heitz
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?