Marcille v. Sanchez et al
Plaintiff: Peter Gregory Marcille
Defendant: Victor Joseph Sanchez and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 1:2019cv00051
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/17/2019. (JDR)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/23/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/23/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/23/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 11:30 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/6/2019. (JDR)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Stephen E. Woodruff, Matthew Thomas Meade, Gregory G. Smith. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/10/2019. (JEC)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER. (JDR)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. (JDR)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Modified on 5/21/2019 to correct text (JDR).
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER filed in State Court to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Victor Joseph Sanchez. (JDR)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against John Does 1-3, Victor Joseph Sanchez, filed by Peter Gregory Marcille. (JDR)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT FILE: DV-34-2018-124-NE, MT 6th Judicial District Court Judicial District Court, Park County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (JDR)
May 3, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number MTX400013553 (JDR)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Victor Joseph Sanchez from MT 6th Judicial District Court, case number DV-2018-124., filed by Victor Joseph Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcille v. Sanchez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Gregory Marcille
Represented By: Stephen E. Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Joseph Sanchez
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Meade
Represented By: Gregory G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?