Roman v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jovone Roman
Defendant: Nancy Ann Berryhill and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00052
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Andrew Saul added to case as Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Nancy A. Berryhill (Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration) terminated. (CDH)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/10/2019. (JEC) Modified on 6/10/2019 - Sent via US Mail to plaintiff (JEC).
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Mailing of Consent Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Victoria L. Francis, Franco Luciano Becia. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/10/2019. Sent via US Mail to plaintiff. (JEC)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Franco Luciano Becia on behalf of Nancy Ann Berryhill (Becia, Franco)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF REGARDING CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE. (current copy of docket sheet; orders and notice mailed to pro se plaintiff) (AMC)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nancy Ann Berryhill. (AEC)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/10/2019. (Documents forwarded to the US Attorney General, US Attorney and Nancy A Berryhill, as directed.) (JDR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2019: #1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service) (JDR).
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail. (AMC)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-mail by Jovone Roman. (AMC)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING LETTER with a consent to electronic service. Pro Se Plaintiff accompanied with his filings a filled out consent; Clerk will send out notification advising pro se plaintiff that the Pro Se Consent for Electronic Filing cannot be used because restriction levels in social security cases will not allow a non-registered user to access documents sent via an NEF. (AMC)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF A SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY OR SUPPLEMENTAL SECURITY INCOME DECISION against Nancy Ann Berryhill filed by Jovone Roman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Request to Waive Service of Summons, #3 Proposed Waiver of Service of Summons) (AMC) Modified on 5/10/2019 - Complaint deemed filed (JDR).
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jovone Roman Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Ann Berryhill
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Franco Luciano Becia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Franco Luciano Becia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovone Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?