Wood v. Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ellen Wood
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company and Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00056
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Laurence R. Martin, Mary E. Duncan, Gary M. Zadick, James R. Zadick, Todd D. Gunderson, John C. Heenan, Joseph Patrick Cook. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 7/26/2019. (JEC)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion. Counsel for Employers Mutual Casualty Company may appear by telephone at the August 20, 2019 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/1/2019. (APP)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION Attend Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Telephone Gary M. Zadick appearing for Defendant Employers Mutual Casualty Company Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Zadick, Gary)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto Owners Mutual Insurance for Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company.. (Duncan, Mary)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/13/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/13/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/13/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 11:30 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/20/2019. (JDR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Employers Mutual Casualty Company. (Zadick, Gary)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Employers Mutual Casualty Company. (Zadick, Gary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Duncan, Mary)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, John Does 1-10, filed by Ellen Wood. (JDR)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, John Does 1-10, filed by Ellen Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 2, #2 Exhibits 3 - 9, #3 Exhibits 10 - 53, #4 Exhibits 54 - 60) (JDR)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT FILE: DV-35-2018-0000006-BF, MT 10th Judicial District Court, PETROLEUM County. Case Register Report, File Certification and File Receipt. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (JDR)
May 23, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2313985 (JDR)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Duncan, Mary)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Employers Mutual Casualty Company from MT 10th Judicial District Court, Petroleum County, case number DV-2018-06., filed by Employers Mutual Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal and Request For Transfer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Laurence R. Martin
Represented By: Mary E. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: James R. Zadick
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Wood
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Cook
Represented By: Todd D. Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?