Big Lake et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Janet Jean Big Lake and Laverne Williamson Big Hair
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00062
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by United States of America. (Francis, Victoria) Modified on 8/2/2019 (AMC).
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Plaintiffs, filed by Laverne Williamson Big Hair. (Stephens, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet Jean Big Lake, Laverne Williamson Big Hair. All Plaintiffs. (Stephens, Robert)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (AMC)
June 5, 2019 FILING FEE PAID: $ 400, receipt number MTX100016222 (AMC)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Janet Jean Big Lake, Laverne Williamson Big Hair. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Lake et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Jean Big Lake
Represented By: Robert L. Stephens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laverne Williamson Big Hair
Represented By: Robert L. Stephens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Tyson M. Lies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?