Tucker v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kimberly Marie Tucker
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00068
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan (JDR)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Mailing of Consent Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Victoria L. Francis, Leisa Wolf, John E. Seidlitz, Jr. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 7/26/2019. (JEC)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Saul. (JDR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Leisa Wolf on behalf of Andrew Saul (Wolf, Leisa)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons and Waiver of Service) (Copies conventionally mailed to the Acting Commissioner of SSA, US Attorney General and US Attorney as directed in the Order.) (JDR)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Kimberly Marie Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JEC) Modified on 6/14/2019 (JDR).
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. John E. Seidlitz, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Kimberly Marie Tucker Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Leisa Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Marie Tucker
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?