Copenhaver et al v. Cavagna North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd Copenhaver and Amber Copenhaver
Defendant: Does 1-10, Blue Rhino Corporation, Cavagna North America, Inc., Albertsons, LLC and Amerigas Propane, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00071
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cavagna North America, Inc.. (Stacey, Calvin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Todd Copenhaver, Amber Copenhaver. Albertsons, LLC waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Morrison, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Todd Copenhaver, Amber Copenhaver. Amerigas Propane, L.P. waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Morrison, John)
July 9, 2019 Set Deadlines: Cavagna North America, Inc. answer due 7/23/2019. (JEC)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Cavagna North America on July 2, 2019, filed by Amber Copenhaver, Todd Copenhaver. (Morrison, John)
July 2, 2019 Set Deadlines: Blue Rhino Corporation answer due 7/18/2019. (JEC)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Blue Rhino Corporation on June 27, 2019, filed by Amber Copenhaver, Todd Copenhaver. (Peterson, Scott)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Albertsons, LLC, Amerigas Propane, L.P., Blue Rhino Corporation, Cavagna North America, Inc. (Original and one copy mailed to attorney) (AMC)
June 25, 2019 Filing fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2329024 (AMC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - CASE NUMBER IS CV-19-71-BLG-SPW-TJC against All Defendants filed by Todd Copenhaver, Amber Copenhaver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copenhaver et al v. Cavagna North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Rhino Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavagna North America, Inc.
Represented By: Calvin J. Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerigas Propane, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Copenhaver
Represented By: Scott L. Peterson
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Copenhaver
Represented By: Scott L. Peterson
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?