Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company v. Stimpson
Plaintiff: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company
Defendant: Travis Stimpson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00072
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CALL ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/18/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/11/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/18/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 09:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/8/2019. (EMH)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company. Travis Stimpson served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Handelman, Leah)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company. (Luck, Bradley)
June 27, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2330652. (EMH)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Travis Stimpson. (original summons with copy of complaint mailed to Attorney Bradley Luck and Leah Handelman for service) (EMH)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against Travis Stimpson, filed by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Policy, #2 Exhibit Dist Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit ROR Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company v. Stimpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Stimpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company
Represented By: Leah T. Handelman
Represented By: Bradley J. Luck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?