McKee v. Saul
Plaintiff: Adam R. McKee
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00084
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. (JDR)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel John E. Seidlitz, Jr, Jeffrey Staples, Victoria L. Francis. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 10/21/2019. (JEH)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Staples on behalf of Andrew Saul (Staples, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Saul. Andrew Saul waiver sent on 8/29/2018, answer due 10/28/2018. Document received on 8/29/2019, incorrectly received as consent. (JEH)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service) (Copies conventionally mailed to the Acting Commissioner of SSA, US Attorney General and US Attorney as directed in the Order.) (AEC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP against Andrew Saul, filed by Adam R. McKee. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (JEC) Modified on 8/14/2019(AEC).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis John E. Seidlitz, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Adam R. McKee Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKee v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam R. McKee
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Jeffrey Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?