McCaffrey v. Parker
Plaintiff: Gavin MCCaffrey
Defendant: Robert Parker
Case Number: 1:2019cv00132
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Gavin McCaffrey. (Gillispie, Daniel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Robert Parker. (Carlson, Robert)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Robert Parker. (Carlson, Robert)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Robert Parker. (Carlson, Robert)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 DEFENDANT'S STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL to #4 Complaint by Robert Parker. (EMH)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR JURY DEMAND against Robert Parker, filed by Gavin MCCaffrey. (EMH)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE : State Court Documents received from Yellowstone County District Court, case DV-56-2019-0001101-NE. (EMH)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/10/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/3/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/10/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/25/2019. (EMH)
November 20, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2402518. (EMH)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Parker from Montana Thirteenth Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County, case number DV 19-1101. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Second Discovery, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCaffrey v. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Parker
Represented By: Marshal L. Mickelson
Represented By: Robert M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin MCCaffrey
Represented By: Daniel Gregory Gillispie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?