Berg-Hernandez v. Correctional Health Partners, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tara Berg-Hernandez
Defendant: Correctional Health Partners, Inc., Yellowstone County, Sam Bofto, Yellowstone County Sheriff's Office, Does A-Z Inclusive and Yellowstone County Detention Facility
Case Number: 1:2020cv00008
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled cause is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/12/2022. (EMH)
August 11, 2022 Filing 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tara Berg-Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Faure, Jean)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER regarding settlement #41 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within 60 days of the date of this Order, the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss together with a proposed order dismissing the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/21/2022. (JLE)
June 21, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Settlement by Tara Berg-Hernandez (Faure, Jean)
June 21, 2022 Filing 40 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Johnston: Settlement Conference held on 6/15/2022. (SLL)
May 17, 2022 Filing 39 Remark: Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), attorneys must update any change in name, e-mail, mailing address, law firm affiliation, and/or telephone number through their PACER accounts. Re: #38 NOTICE of Change of Address by Elizabeth L. Hausbeck. (JLE)
May 11, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Change of Address by Elizabeth L. Hausbeck (Hausbeck, Elizabeth)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order Setting: Settlement Conference set for 6/15/2022 at 09:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/27/2022. **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS** (ACC) Modified on 4/27/2022 to reflect copy of order e-mailed to Blgs clerks. (MMS).
April 27, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John Johnston. (ACC)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT Order: This case has been assigned to the undersigned for the limited purposes of conducting a settlement conference, accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the undersigned will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on 4/26/2022 at 10:15 AM. The call-in number is as follows: 877-402-9753; access code: 5136505. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/25/2022. (SLL)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE granting #34 Motion for Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/25/2022. (JLE)
April 20, 2022 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Conference Katie Rose Ranta appearing for Plaintiff Tara Berg-Hernandez Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ranta, Katie)
March 31, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Browne on behalf of Correctional Health Partners, Inc. (Browne, Ryan)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Deadline (discovery must be served so that responses are due on or before this date): 8/26/2022. Motions Deadline (except motions otherwise scheduled): 10/23/2022. See order for Disclosure Deadlines. All other requirements set forth in the Courts July 9, 2020 Scheduling Order (Doc. 18) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/13/2022. (HEG) (HEG). Modified on 2/1/2022 Document added and NEF regenerated to all parties. (HEG). Modified on 2/1/2022 to correct document number (JEH).
January 13, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Ringel on behalf of Correctional Health Partners, Inc. (Ringel, Andrew)
January 13, 2022 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/13/2022. Order to follow. (WDB)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDERED: The parties Joint Motion for a Telephonic Status Conference is GRANTED. The deadlines set forth in the Amended Scheduling Order (Doc. 27) are VACATED. A telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held on January 13, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall use the Courts conferencing system to participate in the Conference. See order for call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/16/2021. (HEG)
December 16, 2021 Filing 28 Joint MOTION Telephonic Status Conference re #27 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, Ryan Patrick Browne appearing for Defendant Correctional Health Partners, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Browne, Ryan)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Deadline (discovery must be served so that responses are due on or before this date): 3/18/2022. Motions Deadline (except motions otherwise scheduled) : 5/6/2022. See order for Disclosure Deadlines. All other requirements set forth in the Courts July 9, 2020 Scheduling Order (Doc. 18) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/22/2021. (HEG)
July 21, 2021 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #25 Scheduling Order, Ryan Patrick Browne appearing for Defendant Correctional Health Partners, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Order) (Browne, Ryan)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Deadline (discovery mustbe served so that responses are due on or before this date): 10/29/2021. Motions Deadline (except motions otherwise scheduled): 12/17/2021. See order for complete details and deadlines. All other requirements set forth in the Courts July 9, 2020 Scheduling Order (Doc. 18) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/28/2021. (HEG)
January 28, 2021 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Scheduling Conference held on 1/28/2021. Order to follow. (WDB)
January 25, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel: David Matthew McLean and Ryan C. Willmore withdrawing from the case, filed by Correctional Health Partners, Inc. (McLean, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Browne on behalf of Correctional Health Partners, Inc. (Browne, Ryan)
January 13, 2021 Filing 21 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Tara Berg-Hernandez. (Ranta, Katie)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDERED: All deadlines in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 18) are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on January 28, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan for the purpose of resetting the deadlines. Counsel shall use the Courts conferencing system. See order for call-in information. On or before January 15, 2021, the parties shall file an updated proposed joint discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/6/2021. (HEG)
January 6, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Jason T. Holden appearing for Plaintiff Tara Berg-Hernandez Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Holden, Jason)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 10/9/2020. Discovery due by 4/6/2021. Motion for Settlement Conference Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge due by 4/6/2021. Motions (except motions otherwise scheduled) due by 5/24/2021. See order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/9/2020. (HEG)
July 9, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 7/9/2020. Order to follow. (WDB)
July 9, 2020 Filing 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Yellowstone County. (Lervick, Jeana)
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Tara Berg-Hernandez. (Ranta, Katie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Tara Berg-Hernandez. (Ranta, Katie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Correctional Health Partners, Inc.. (Willmore, Ryan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Correctional Health Partners, Inc.. (Willmore, Ryan)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting: Joint Proposed Discovery, Preliminary Pretrial Statement and Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/2/2020. A telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference shall be held on July 9, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Lead trial counsel for the respective parties are required to participate in the conference. Counsel shall use the Courts conferencing system. See order for call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/20/2020. (HEG)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Correctional Health Partners, Inc.. (McLean, David)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Correctional Health Partners, Inc.. (McLean, David)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER WITHHOLDING CONSENT. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Watters. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/21/2020. (JDR)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Jason T. Holden, Travis A. Cushman, Jeana R. Lervick, David Matthew McLean. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 4/16/2020. (ACC)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Correctional Health Partners, Inc.. Correctional Health Partners, Inc. waiver sent on 3/12/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (McLean, David)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Matthew McLean on behalf of Correctional Health Partners, Inc. (McLean, David)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sam Bofto, Yellowstone County, Yellowstone County Detention Facility, Yellowstone County Sheriff's Office. (Lervick, Jeana)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants, filed by Tara Berg-Hernandez. (JDR)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT FILE: DV-56-2019-925-NE, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (JDR)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Yellowstone County Sheriff's Office, Sam Bofto, Yellowstone County, Yellowstone County Detention Facility from MT 13th Judicial District Court, case number DV-19-925. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)
February 10, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2439791 (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg-Hernandez v. Correctional Health Partners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Partners, Inc.
Represented By: David Matthew McLean
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Browne
Represented By: Ryan C. Willmore
Represented By: Andrew D. Ringel
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Hausbeck
Represented By: Jennifer L. Swajkoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowstone County
Represented By: Jeana R. Lervick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Bofto
Represented By: Jeana R. Lervick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowstone County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Jeana R. Lervick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does A-Z Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowstone County Detention Facility
Represented By: Jeana R. Lervick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Berg-Hernandez
Represented By: Travis A. Cushman
Represented By: Jason T. Holden
Represented By: Katie Rose Ranta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?