Edmunds Jr. v. Saul
Plaintiff: Charles K. Edmunds Jr.
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00017
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate as Presiding Judge. Mailed to Counsel John E. Seidlitz, Jr, Frederick D. Fripps, Victoria L. Francis. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 4/13/2020. (NOS)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick D. Fripps on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Fripps, Frederick)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (JDR) Modified on 3/13/2020 to correct filed date (JDR).
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Documents mailed as directed in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/5/2020. (HEG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #1 Notice/Waiver Documents) (HEG).
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (IFP) against Andrew M. Saul (Filing fee $ IFP Pending.), filed by Charles K. Edmunds Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summonses) (JDR) Modified on 3/5/2020 to remove LODGED text as Complaint is deemed filed. (HEG).
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. John E. Seidlitz, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Charles K. Edmunds Jr. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmunds Jr. v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles K. Edmunds Jr.
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Frederick D. Fripps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?