Dalbotten v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Maria Dalbotten
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv00034
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery. Defendant's have up to and including July 10, 2020 to respond. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/22/2020. (EMH)
May 20, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve /Respond to Discovery filed by Maria Dalbotten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Scarpelli, Nicholas)
May 15, 2020 Filing 34 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve /Respond to Discovery filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (McIntosh, Ian)
May 15, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve /Respond to Discovery Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (McIntosh, Ian)
May 12, 2020 Filing 32 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Maria Dalbotten. (Scarpelli, Nicholas)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/2/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/26/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/2/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/14/2020. (EMH)
April 13, 2020 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT Joint by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (McIntosh, Ian)
April 8, 2020 Remark: PHV attorney Nicholas Scarpelli is now a registered e-filer and can receive electronic notices in this case. (EMH)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tyler D. Coombe for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and for C R Bard Incorporated. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/7/2020. (EMH)
April 7, 2020 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION Tyler D. Coombe to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2466221.) Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (McIntosh, Ian)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Admit Nicholas P. Scarpelli, Jr. Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/6/2020. (EMH)
April 6, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #25 Unopposed MOTION Nicholas P. Scarpelli, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2465539.) by Maria Dalbotten. (Lewis, Tom)
April 6, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION Nicholas P. Scarpelli, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2465539.) Tom L. Lewis appearing for Plaintiff Maria Dalbotten (Lewis, Tom)
April 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (McIntosh, Ian)
March 31, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Tom L. Lewis on behalf of Maria Dalbotten (Lewis, Tom)
March 30, 2020 Filing 22 DISCOVERY ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 20 MISCELLANEOUS ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 19 DAUBERT ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 18 MASTER AND SHORT-FORM PLEADINGS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 17 DISCOVERY AND PRIVILEGE ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 16 DEPOSITION DESIGNATION ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 15 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 TRANSFER ORDER FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 DISREGARD - DUPLICATE OF DOCUMENT #12 . CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET SHEET FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH) Modified on 3/30/2020 (JEH).
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET SHEET FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties in the above-captioned case file a joint status report with this Court explaining the status of this case by April 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/30/2020. (EMH)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-02275. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (EMH, )
March 27, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the District of Montana via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
July 13, 2016 Filing 6 REPORT Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Maria Dalbotten. (Scarpelli, Nicholas) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
July 12, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX173872 as to Nicholas P Scarpelli, Jr. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
July 11, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Nicholas P Scarpelli Jr on behalf of Maria Dalbotten. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
July 11, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Maria Dalbotten. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
July 11, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-2275-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
July 11, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX173872 filed by Maria Dalbotten.(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalbotten v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler D. Coombe
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler D. Coombe
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Dalbotten
Represented By: Nicholas P Scarpelli, Jr
Represented By: Tom L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?