DeAngelo et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Salvatore DeAngelo and Barbara DeAngelo
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv00036
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tyler D. Coombe for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated,Tyler D. Coombe for C R Bard Incorporated. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/20/2020. (EMH)
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION Tyler D. Coombe to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2470799.) Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tyler Coombe, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (McIntosh, Ian)
April 10, 2020 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (McIntosh, Ian)
April 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (McIntosh, Ian)
March 30, 2020 Filing 17 DISCOVERY ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 15 MISCELLANEOUS ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 DAUBERT ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 MASTER AND SHORT-FORM PLEADINGS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 DISCOVERY AND PRIVILEGE ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 DEPOSITION DESIGNATION ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ORDERS FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET SHEET FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties in the above-captioned case file a joint status report with this Court explaining the status of this case. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/30/2020. (EMH)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-04353. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (EMH, )
March 27, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the District of Montana via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
December 12, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-4353-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]
December 12, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13705716 filed by Salvatore DeAngelo, Barbara DeAngelo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeAngelo et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler D. Coombe
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler D. Coombe
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore DeAngelo
Represented By: Teresa C Toriseva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara DeAngelo
Represented By: Teresa C Toriseva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?