XE Corporation v. Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc.
Plaintiff: XE Corporation
Defendant: Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00039
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION Andrew C. Orr to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2489443.) W. Scott Mitchell appearing for Defendant Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc., Counter Claimant Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew C. Orr, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Mitchell, W.)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 9/2/2020. Discovery due by 2/2/2021. Motion for Settlement Conference Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge due by 2/2/2021. Motions (except motions otherwise scheduled) due by 3/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/3/2020. (HEG)
June 2, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/2/2020. (Law Clerk: J. Byorth), (JDR)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by XE Corporation. (Landers, Frederick)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc.. (Mitchell, W.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by XE Corporation. (Landers, Frederick)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by XE Corporation. (Landers, Frederick)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan (JDR)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XE Corporation. (Landers, Frederick)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by XE Corporation. (Landers, Frederick)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Cavan as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel W. Scott Mitchell, Frederick Poole Landers, Jr, Amanda G. Hunter.Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 5/8/2020. (APP)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc., filed by XE Corporation. (JDR)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 STATE COURT FILE: DV-11-2020-11-AU, MT 7th Judicial District Court, Dawson County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. Original file held in the clerk's office on the open civil case shelf. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 File Receipt) (JDR)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Lead trial counsel for the respective parties are required to participate in the conference. Counsel must follow these steps to use the Courts conferencing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/14/2020. (HEG)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant Thatcher Company of North Dakota's ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against XE Corporation by Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc.. (Mitchell, W.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Thatcher Group, Inc. for Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc... (Mitchell, W.)
April 6, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2465600 (JDR)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc. from MT 7th Judicial District Court, Dawson County case number DV-20-011., filed by Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XE Corporation v. Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XE Corporation
Represented By: Frederick Poole Landers, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda G. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thatcher Company of North Dakota, Inc.
Represented By: W. Scott Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?