United States Of America v. Price
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Larry Wayne Price, Jr.
Intervenor Defendant: Three Blind Mice, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00074
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Gustafson on behalf of Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Gustafson, Ryan)
June 2, 2020 Set Deadlines: Admissions/Notice of Appearance due by 7/2/2020. (EMH)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/2/2020. (EMH)
June 2, 2020 Remark: case number assigned to transfer case USA v. Price, from the Western division of Virginia, is Montana case number CV-20-74-BLG-SPW. (EMH)
June 2, 2020 Filing 101 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00027. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (EMH, )
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order transferring case to the United States District Court for the District of Montana, Billings Division. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/1/2020. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE by United States Of America (Frith, Krista) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on June 10, 2019 before Honorable Judge James P. Jones. Official Court Reporter Donna Prather, Telephone number 276-628-5116 donnap@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 7/23/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2019. (dp) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 97 Financial arrangements made (Original) (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) re #93 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 8/1/2019. (dp) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE by Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Joint Notice) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holt, Kevin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 95 E-mail from the Court to parties requesting certain documents (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2019 re #88 MOTION to Amend/Correct PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER filed by Three Blind Mice, LLC. (Court Reporter: Donna Prather, OCR) (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) by Larry Wayne Price, Jr for Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction Order held on June 10, 2019 reported by Court Reporter Donna Prather before Judge Hon. James P. Jones. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Holt, Kevin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 92 RESPONSE to Motion re #88 MOTION to Amend/Correct PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER (Supplemental Response). filed by Larry Wayne Price, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holt, Kevin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 91 RESPONSE to Motion re #88 MOTION to Amend/Correct PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER . filed by Larry Wayne Price, Jr. (Holt, Kevin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #88 MOTION to Amend/Correct PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing via Conference Call set for 6/10/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 89 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #88 MOTION to Amend/Correct PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER . filed by Three Blind Mice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plea Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Virginia Judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Montana Judgment, #4 Exhibit D - 8/2/18 Letter from W. William Gust, #5 Exhibit E - 4/30/19 Order, #6 Exhibit F - 4/26/19 Brief to Set Aside Judgment)(Nelson, Randall) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION to Amend/Correct PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER by Three Blind Mice, LLC. (Nelson, Randall) Modified on 5/8/19 to remove referral text from docket entry. [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER TO RELEASE CASH BOND. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/27/2019. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER TO RELEASE CASH BOND. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/18/2019. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 85 Email by Mary Lou Prillaman to the Court dated 3/12/19 in re: Revised Proposed Sale as to Larry Wayne Price, Jr. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 AMENDED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER; Three Blind Mice, LLC's Motion for Release of Certain Properties from Temporary Restraining Order for Execution Sale is GRANTED; the Preliminary Injunction Order remains in effect in all other respects. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/25/19. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Status Conference held on 2/20/2019. (Court Reporter: Donna Prather, OCR) (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) : Status Conference via Conference Call set for 2/20/2019 at 11:30 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #77 MOTION for Release of Certain Properties from TRO for Execution Sale . filed by Three Blind Mice, LLC. (Nelson, Randall) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 80 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #77 MOTION for Release of Certain Properties from TRO for Execution Sale . filed by Larry Wayne Price, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Holt, Kevin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Minute Order. Intervenor/Defendant Three Blind Mice has filed a motion seeking release of certain property from restraint by prior order of this court. If any of the other parties object to such motion, they must file the grounds of their objection within 14 days of this date. Intervenor/Defendant may file a reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 11/21/2018. (JPJ) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 78 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #77 MOTION for Release of Certain Properties from TRO for Execution Sale . filed by Three Blind Mice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Foreign Judgments, #2 Exhibit B - VA Deeds, #3 Exhibit C - Schlidt Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - Consiglio Email, #5 Exhibit E - QCD 1, #6 Exhibit F - QCD 2, #7 Exhibit G - QCD 3, #8 Exhibit H - QCD 4, #9 Exhibit I - Casher Affidavit)(Nelson, Randall) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Release of Certain Properties from TRO for Execution Sale by Three Blind Mice, LLC.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Nelson, Randall) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint #1 for Injunctive Relief by Three Blind Mice, LLC.(Nelson, Randall) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Jessee on behalf of Three Blind Mice, LLC (Jessee, John) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 74 Letter to the Court from the Court Appointed Receiver in re: Approval for Firearms Auction. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE by Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Joint Notice) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holt, Kevin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Walker Holt on behalf of Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Holt, Kevin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER granting #70 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Three Blind Mice, LLC answer due 11/19/2018. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/24/2018. (JPJ) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Three Blind Mice, LLC. (Nelson, Randall) Modified on 10/24/2018 - removed referral text (ejs). [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 69 Response re #67 Order on Motion to Intervene, . filed by Ninety M, LLC. (Long, Joshua) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/18/18. (ejs) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #61 Motion to Intervene; Motion is granted as to Three Blind Mice LLC; the Clerk is directed to add the entity as a defendant to this action; and the intervenor must file an answer to the Complaint within 14 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/18/18. (ejs) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT re #65 Reply to Response to Motion OF RANDALL G. NELSON by Three Blind Mice, LLC (Nelson, Randall) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #61 MOTION to Intervene . filed by Three Blind Mice, LLC. (Nelson, Randall) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 64 Notice of Cancellation of Status Conference via conference call set for 10/17/2018 at 11:30 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE by Larry Wayne Price, Jr re #61 (Notice of Objection) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Communications from Nelson and Three Blind Mice)(Bondurant, Thomas) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 62 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #61 MOTION to Intervene . filed by Three Blind Mice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deeds)(Nelson, Randall) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION to Intervene by Three Blind Mice, LLC.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Nelson, Randall) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Status Conference via conference call set for 10/17/2018 11:30 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 59 Email Correspondence between the Court and Counsel. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying #57 Joint Motion to Enter a Stipulated Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/12/18. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 57 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Stipulated) by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Consiglio, Krista) Modified on 10/11/2018 to remove referral text from docket entry(flc). [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #50 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part #20 Motion to Amend Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/11/18. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 55 First Email to Counsel from the Court. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 54 Second Email to the Court from the United States Of America (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 53 Third Email to the Court from Defense Counsel as to Larry Wayne Price, Jr (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 52 Response of Three Blind Mice to Court's Inquiry. filed by Three Blind Mice, LLC. (Nelson, Randall) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 51 Response re #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Petition for Attorneys' Fees) . filed by United States Of America. (Consiglio, Krista) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Petition for Attorneys' Fees) by Larry Wayne Price, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bondurant, Thomas) Modified on 10/9/2018 to remove referral text from docket entry (flc). [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 49 Response re #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Temporary Restraining Order,, Order to Show Cause, (Petition to Amend TRO) . filed by Three Blind Mice, LLC. (Nelson, Randall) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 48 Email correspondence pertaining to #20 Motion to Amend TRO (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Justin Michael Lugar terminated. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/4/18. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 MOTION for Randall Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney. Randall G. Nelson for Three Blind Mice, LLC added. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/29/18. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter William Gust on behalf of Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Gust, Walter) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Justin M. Lugar) by Larry Wayne Price, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lugar, Justin) Modified on 9/4/2018 to remove referral text from docket entry (flc). [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Ephraim Simmons on behalf of Ninety M, LLC (Simmons, Justin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION for Randall G. Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Ninety M, LLC.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration), #2 Exhibit B (Proposed Order))(Long, Joshua) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua F.P. Long on behalf of Ninety M, LLC (Long, Joshua) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER APPROVING the #38 Consignment Agreement filed by Larry Wayne Price, Jr; and authorizes Defendant to execute and enter into and perform said agreement. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/27/18. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE by United States Of America re #33 , #35 , #38 Withdrawal of Objections Pending Execution of Consignment Agreement (Consiglio, Krista) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by Larry Wayne Price, Jr re #35 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consignment Agreement)(Bondurant, Thomas) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; (Dft's Response due by 8/24/2018). Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/20/18. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 Response by Larry Wayne Price, Jr.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bondurant, Thomas) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 35 Response re #33 Notice (Other) and Objection. filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Consiglio, Krista) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE by Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Bondurant, Thomas) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AGREED ORDER permitting parties to engage in third-party discovery pursuant to Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 07/30/2018. (ab) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order reserving decision on the defendant's Petition to Amend Temporary Restraining Order (TRO), ECF #20 , pending the additional information requested by the United States. Additional information must be provided by the defendant no later than 8/10/2018. The United States may file objections within 7 days of its receipt. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/27/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 30 Exhibit List - Motion Hearing (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Exhibit #1) (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Motion Hearing held on 7/27/2018 re #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause, (Petition to Amend TRO)filed by Larry Wayne Price, Jr. (Court Reporter: JoRita Meyer, OCR) (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Temporary Restraining Order,, Order to Show Cause, (Petition to Amend TRO) : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) : Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2018 at 10:30 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AGREED ORDER; Answer is due 14 days after the preliminary injunction hearing is held. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/19/18. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 26 Letter to the Court in re: TRO as to Larry Wayne Price, JR. by Mary Lou Prillaman (Court Appointed Receiver) (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Temporary Restraining Order,, Order to Show Cause, (Petition to Amend TRO) . filed by Larry Wayne Price, Jr. (Lugar, Justin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE by Larry Wayne Price, Jr re #23 Notice of Intent to File Reply to Government's Response (DeGraw, Jennifer) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Temporary Restraining Order,, Order to Show Cause, (Petition to Amend TRO) . filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Receiver)(Consiglio, Krista) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION Motion for Clarification of Court Order re #19 Temporary Restraining Order by Larry Wayne Price, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGraw, Jennifer) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute Order. Defendant has filed a Petition to Amend Temporary Restraining Order (#20). The United States is directed to file a response no later than 5 p.m. on Monday, July 16, 2018. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/11/2018. (JPJ) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Temporary Restraining Order,, Order to Show Cause, (Petition to Amend TRO) by Larry Wayne Price, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jewelry Inventory)(Bondurant, Thomas) Modified on 7/11/2018 to remove referral text from docket entry(flc). [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER extending the TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #4 through the Court's entry of an order regarding the United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 . Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/2/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Cancellation of Show Cause Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2018 at 1:30 PM (No Interpreter requested)(lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Court Hearing held on 7/2/2018. (Court Reporter: JoRita Meyer, OCR) (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 16 Marshal's Return of service of Complaint on 6/29/2018 upon Larry Wayne Price, Jr.(lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . filed by United States Of America. (Consiglio, Krista) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Larry Wayne Price, Jr.(lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by Larry Wayne Price, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MT Complaint & Confession of Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Property Listing, #3 Exhibit C - Letter of Intent, #4 Exhibit D - Mine Owner Listing, #5 Exhibit E - Communication with Probation)(Bondurant, Thomas) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Michael Lugar on behalf of Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Lugar, Justin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Jack Bondurant, Jr on behalf of Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Bondurant, Thomas) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 10 Notice Rescheduling Hearing (CR) (No Interpreter requested) previously set for 6/25/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge James P. Jones in Abingdon. Show Cause Hearing and Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 7/2/2018 01:30 PM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to extend TRO, to continue Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction Hearing and extending time to respond to plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/20/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Extension by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Consiglio, Krista) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Mary Lou Prillaman, Criminal Investigator appointed. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/12/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Temporary Receiver by United States Of America. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Show Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2018 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Show Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2018 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Show Cause Response due by 6/20/2018, reply due on or before 6/22/2018). Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/11/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Larry Wayne Price, Jr, filed by United States Of America. #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lml). [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Wayne Price, Jr.
Represented By: Walter William Gust
Represented By: Justin Michael Lugar
Represented By: Kevin Walker Holt
Represented By: Thomas Jack Bondurant, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer Scott DeGraw
Represented By: Ryan J. Gustafson
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Three Blind Mice, LLC
Represented By: Randall G. Nelson
Represented By: John Edward Jessee
Represented By: Joshua F.P. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel P. Bubar
Represented By: Steven Randall Ramseyer
Represented By: Krista Consiglio Frith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?