Byorth et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Case Number: 1:2020cv00076
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting 215 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 10/15/2020. (APP)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER denying 183 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 9/2/2020. (APP)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting 186 Motion for Leave to Appear by video conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 7/8/2020. (JEH)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 167 Motion to Sever; the Clerk of Court is directed to create a second case number for this action. FURTHER ORDERED that a telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on June 9, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. to confirm and set trial dates for each case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 6/4/2020. (CDH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byorth et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?