Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC v. Morgan Exploration, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC
Defendant: Morgan Exploration, LLC and Robert T. Morgan Family Limited Partnership
Case Number: 1:2020cv00089
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC re #5 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Compton, Patrick)
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC re #12 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Thornton, J.)
July 14, 2020 Remark: PHV attorney Patrick Compton is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFs. Remark (JDR)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC. Morgan Exploration, LLC waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; Robert T. Morgan Family Limited Partnership waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Thornton, J.)
July 10, 2020 Remark: PHV attorney J. Matthew Thornton is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFs. (JDR)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Letter mailed to PHV counsel Thornton. (HEG)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for J. Matthew Thornton to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/23/2020. Copy mailed to PHV counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/8/2020. (HEG)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION Matt Thornton to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2506540.) Edward J. Guza appearing for Plaintiff Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Guza, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Morgan Exploration, LLC. (Emailed to Plaintiff's counsel.) (NOS)
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Robert T. Morgan Family Limited Partnership. (Emailed to Plaintiff's counsel.) (NOS)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC, re #1 Complaint (Guza, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC, re #1 Complaint (Guza, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Order and Letter mailed to PHV counsel. (HEG)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Patrick G. Compton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/6/2020. (HEG)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION Patrick Compton to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2505073.) Edward J. Guza appearing for Plaintiff Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit) (Guza, Edward)
June 25, 2020 Remark: PHV Refund $255.00 processed to original payment method for Account Holder Leslie T. (HEG)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED: Bayswaters motion to admit Mr. Compton pro hac vice is DENIED without prejudice. Bayswater may resubmit its motion, provided the motion is accompanied by an affidavit that complies in full with L.R. 83.1(d)(3). Finance notified to process refund. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/25/2020. (HEG)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Patrick Compton to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2500331.) Edward J. Guza appearing for Plaintiff Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Guza, Edward)
June 19, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2498406. (JEH)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Morgan Exploration, LLC, Robert T. Morgan Family Limited Partnership filed by Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment to civil cover sheet) (JEH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC v. Morgan Exploration, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Exploration, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Morgan Family Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayswater Exploration & Production, LLC
Represented By: Edward J. Guza
Represented By: J. Matthew Thornton
Represented By: Patrick G. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?